Our governors play a vital role within our school development. They support the leaders to plan key improvements, allocate funding and evaulate progress against the school development plan.
Governor Information
Type of governor |
Start Date |
End Date | Name | Position within the governing body | Pecuniary Interest | Profile |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Executive Head Teacher |
01/09/19 |
Jude Busari |
Executive Head Teacher | Executive Head Teacher of Ashton CofE Primary School |
|
|
Staff Governor | 24/01/24 | 24/01/28 | Hannah Major |
Staff Governor
|
|
|
Chair of Governors |
01/10/20 | 30/09/2024 |
Jane Lambert |
Health and Safety and Safeguarding Governor |
None |
|
Co-opted Governor & Vice Chair | 01/03/2023 | 28/02/2027 |
Rosie Paul |
Vice Chair Curriculum and Standards Committee Member, Literacy Governor |
None |
|
Parent Governor |
10/10/22 |
09/10/26
|
Avril Peacock |
Parent Governor | None |
|
LA Governor | 24/01/24 | 24/01/28 | Nikki Slaughter | LA Governor |
|
|
Co-opted Governor | 24/01/24 | 24/01/28 | Matt Ashmead | Co-opted Governor |
|
|
Parent Governor | 24/01/24 | 24/01/28 | Manjeet Rooke | Parent Governor |
Attendance Data
Attendance at meetings in academic year 2023-24:
9th September 2023 | 24th January 2024 | 30th April 2024 | 17th July 2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Jude Busari | Present | Present | Present | |
Tracey Steel | Present | End of term of office | End of term of office | |
Rosie Paul | Present | Present | Resigned | |
Jane Lambert | Present | Apologies | Present | |
Avril Peacock | Present | Present | Present | |
Matt Ashmead | Not yet appointed | Present | Present | |
Manjeet Rooke | Not yet appointed | Present | Apologies | |
Nikki Slaughter | Not yet appointed | Present | Present | |
Hannah Major | Not yet appointed | Present | Present |
Copies of minutes of governoing body meetings are kept at school. If you require access to these please put this request in writing and address to the Chair of Governors. You are not able to access confidential minutes.